Trustees PORT
Charity number: 1114217

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN STEWART | Chair | 16 May 2006 |
|
|
||||
ABIGAIL ANDREWS | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nigel John Meadows | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
BARRY JOHN STEWART | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY CARMICHAEL | Trustee | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ashlee Johnson | Trustee | 08 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kilian Fitzsimmons-Wilson | Trustee | 28 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA MARY STANIER | Trustee | 05 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
SONIA FROST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN FROST | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.