JAMES SQUARE PLYMOUTH LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objects and principal activities are to further the advancement of further education for the University of Plymouth and its students and students of other educational institutions and others in need of housing attending education and training or other courses or events at the University of Plymouth or in Devon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£1,354,000
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £18.00k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.34m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£653,000
Raising funds | £635.00k | |
Charitable activities | £18.00k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £635.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £18.00k | |
Retained for future use | £701.00k |
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 April 2006: Standard registration
- UPP (JAMES SQUARE PLYMOUTH) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Marie Fielder | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martinus Maria Berkien | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Derrick Burdett | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julian True | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive Wilson Crawford | Trustee | 19 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.20m | £1.19m | £1.21m | £1.90m | £1.35m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.21m | £1.19m | £1.18m | £1.19m | £653.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £72.00k | £0 | £0 | £87.00k | £18.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.13m | £1.11m | £1.21m | £1.81m | £1.34m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £72.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £72.00k | £72.00k | £83.00k | £87.00k | £18.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.13m | £0 | £0 | £1.10m | £635.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £63.00k | £62.00k | £68.00k | £72.00k | £3.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £10.00k | £0 | £15.00k | £15.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £1.13m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £1.12m | £1.10m | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £25.13m | £24.77m | £24.02m | £24.28m | £23.97m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £25.09m | £24.74m | £23.96m | £23.52m | £22.50m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 1 MARCH 2006 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 NOVEMBER 2006 AND 20 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
3.1. TO FURTHER THE PROVISION AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY: 3.1.1. PURCHASING OR OTHERWISE ACQUIRING, CONSTRUCTING, REFURBISHING, PROVIDING AND MANAGING: (A) FACILITIES OF HIGHER AND FURTHER EDUCATION, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO RESEARCH CENTRES, LABORATORIES, LIBRARIES, SPORTS FACILITIES, LECTURE THEATRES AND ACADEMIC FACULTIES: AND (B) HALLS OF RESIDENCE, HOUSES, HOSTELS OR ANY OTHER HOUSING ACCOMMODATION INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE PROVISION OF SHORT ASSURED TENANCIES; AND 3.1.2. PROVIDING ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES, SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE FOR THE UNIVERSITY OF PLYMOUTH AND ITS STUDENTS AND STUDENTS OF OTHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND OTHERS IN NEED OF HOUSING ATTENDING (WHETHER OR NOT AS STUDENTS) EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING OR OTHER COURSES OR EVENTS AT THE UNIVERSITY OF PLYMOUTH OR WITHIN DEVON; 3.2 TO SUPPORT, AID AND ASSIST IN ANY WAY THE ACTIVITIES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PLYMOUTH AS AN INSTITUTION OF EDUCATION, LEARNING AND RESEARCH; 3.3 TO PROVIDE HOUSING AND ASSOCIATED AMENITIES AND SERVICES FOR: 3.3.1 PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; 3.3.2 ANY OTHER PERSONS FOR WHOM IT WOULD BE CHARITABLE TO PROVIDE HOUSES, HOSTELS OR OTHER HOUSING ACCOMMODATION
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Floor
12 ARTHUR STREET
London
EC4R 9AB
- Phone:
- 02073987200
- Email:
- compliance@upp-ltd.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window