ST GABRIEL'S PARISH HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DAYTIME BOOKINGS FOR THEATRE, OPERA AND MUSIC REHEARSALS FOR REGISTERED CHARITABLE ORGANISATION DURING THE WEEK. AT WEEKENDS AND EVENINGS THERE ARE MORE COMMUNITY EVENTS FOR CHARITIES ALSO. THERE ARE MANY CHURCHES WHO MEET ON A REGULAR BASIS AND SPORTS GROUPS. ALSO THE LOCAL SCOUTS GROUP MEETS EVERY WEEK. THERE ARE REGULAR MEETINGS ASSOCIATED WITH ST GABRIEL'S CHURCH AND OTHER RELIGIOUS BODIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 May 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST GABRIEL'S CHURCH | Trustee | 15 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £283.95k | £90.52k | £198.03k | £259.49k | £290.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £176.52k | £185.93k | £134.85k | £223.44k | £206.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 NOVEMBER 1900 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 6 OCTOBER 1939
Charitable objects
1 FOR THE CELEBRATION OF DIVINE SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE RITES AND CEREMONIES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AS BY LAW ESTABLISHED. 2 AS A HALL OR PLACE OF MEETING FOR THE RECREATION OR INSTRUCTION OR OTHERWISE FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND RESIDENT IN THE SAID ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GABRIEL PIMLICO AND SUCH OTHER PERSONS AS THE TRUSTEES OR TRUSTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME EITHER GENERALLY OR IN ANY PARTICULAR CASE DIRECT OR PERMIT. 3 AS A PLACE OF MEETING FOR DISTRICT VISITORS OR FOR ANY COMMITTEE OR SOCIETIES OR OTHER BODIES IN THE SAID ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH WHICH ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OR FOR MEETINGS TO BE CALLED IN AID OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY COMMITTEE SOCIETY OBJECT OR CAUSE CONNECTED WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. 4 AS A PLACE OF MEETING FOR ANY CLUB GUILD SOCIETY OR INSTITUTE WHOLLY OR MAINLY COMPOSED OF MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND WHO BELONG TO THE LABOURING MANUFACTURING OR OTHER POORER CLASSES OR AS A GYMNASIUM READING ROOM BILLIARD ROOM OR RECREATION ROOM FOR THEIR USE. 5 AS A CLASS ROOM MEETING ROOM READING ROOM OR LECTURE ROOM FOR MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OR FOR CLASSES FOR COMMUNICANTS OR CANDIDATES FOR CONFIRMATION OR OTHERWISE FOR THE RELIGIOUS OR SECULAR INSTRUCTION OF MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. 6 AS A LENDING LIBRARY FOR THE USE OF MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. 7 AS A KITCHEN OR PLACE FOR PROVIDING FOOD OR OTHER RELIEF FOR THE NECESSITOUS POOR OR FOR PROVIDING FOOD OR REFRESHMENT FOR ANY PERSONS WHO SHALL BE UPON THE PREMISES FOR OR IN CONNECTION WITH ANY OF THE PURPOSES HEREIN MENTIONED. 8 AS A RESIDENCE FOR A CARETAKER PARISH NURSE MISSION WOMAN OR OTHER WORKER IN THE SAID ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH ENGLAND. 9 FOR ANY OTHER MEETINGS OR FOR ANY OTHER OBJECTS ENDS OR PURPOSES HAVING IN VIEW THE SPIRITUAL INTELLECTUAL MORAL OR SOCIAL NEEDS OF MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE SAID ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH WHICH MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE APPROVED EITHER GENERALLY OR IN A PARTICULAR CASE BY THE TRUSTEES OR TRUSTEE..
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GABRIEL, PIMLICO
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. GABRIELS PARISH HOUSE
CHURCHILL GARDENS
LONDON
SW1V 3AA
- Phone:
- 02078280185
- Email:
- info@stgabrielshalls.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window