YOUTH SAILING @ CHASEWATER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Sailing @ Chasewater offers a fun and friendly way for youngsters (ages 10-18) to sail, whether learning from scratch or improving existing skills. We offer a full training programme, run by RYA qualified instructors, which sees absolute beginners sailing solo in as little as two sessions, if they feel confident enough to do so.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 17 May 2006: Standard registration
- 30 December 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.72k | £4.34k | £3.38k | £3.36k | £3.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.13k | £4.76k | £3.86k | £3.06k | £3.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 30 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 24 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 07 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 AUGUST 2005.
Charitable objects
(1.1) THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR AND PROMOTE PARTICIPATION IN SAILING AND ALLIED SAILING ACTIVITIES BY YOUNG PEOPLE. (1.2) MEMBERSHIP WILL BE OPEN TO THE WHOLE COMMUNITY BETWEEN THE AGES OF 1O (THIS INCLUDES YOUNG PEOPLE THAT WILL BE 10 IN THAT CALENDAR YEAR) AND 18 (OR 21, IF RECEIVING FULL-TIME EDUCATION) (1.3) THE ASSOCIATION WILL BE NON-PROFIT MAKING AND ALL FUNDS WILL BE USED IN PURSUIT OF THE OBJECTIVES IDENTIFIED ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window