ROTHERHAM FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide education and training in family history to members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Rotherham
Governance
- 06 April 2006: Standard registration
- 28 March 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 28 March 2019: Funds transferred to 516226 DONCASTER & DISTRICT FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
- RFHS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.11k | £4.52k | £3.07k | £2.23k | £5.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.99k | £5.35k | £3.99k | £3.50k | £3.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 10 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 16 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 26 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN FAMILY HISTORY AND GENEALOGY WITHIN THE AREA OF INTEREST. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE SOCIETY MAY ARRANGE: I) TO PROVIDE A FORUM FOR MEMBERS TO MEET AND DISCUSS THE STUDY OF FAMILY HISTORY AND GENEALOGY; II) TO PRODUCE A NEWSLETTER/JOURNAL REGULARLY; III) TO ARRANGE A PROGRAMME OF LECTURES, VISITS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES CONNECTED WITH SUBJECTS OF INTEREST TO THE SOCIETY; IV) TO SEEK OUT, TRANSCRIBE, INDEX AND WHENEVER POSSIBLE, PUBLISH OR MAKE AVAILABLE MATERIAL RELEVANT TO THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIETY; V) TO PROVIDE GUIDANCE IN FAMILY HISTORY RESEARCH AND STUDY, TO THOSE LIVING ELSEWHERE WHOSE FAMILIES COME FROM THE AREA VI) TO HOLD AND MAINTAIN A LIBRARY OF PRINTED AND OTHER WORKS FOR THE USE OF SOCIETY MEMBERS AND, IF PRACTICABLE EXTEND THIS TO INTERESTED MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
ROTHERHAM, SOUTH YORKSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window