AVON BUSINESS & LEISURE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ARE A COMMUNITY CENTRE HIRING ROOMS TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND RUNNING A NUMBER OF CLASSES FOR THE PUBLIC ON OUR PREMISES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 01 June 2006: Standard registration
- AVON BUSINESS & LEISURE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Corns | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Pavior | Trustee | 31 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Craig Brown | Trustee | 31 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Donald Meeks | Trustee | 31 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ARTHUR CORNS | Trustee | 27 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
GAVIN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DARREN WILLETTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANITA ITALLINA CASTELLINA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA DENTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CRAIG PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR LARRY CASTELLINA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.24k | £84.29k | £80.92k | £68.48k | £68.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.98k | £60.78k | £60.49k | £65.41k | £76.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £51.32k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 20 AUG 2019
Charitable objects
(A) PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF CANNOCK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATION WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND (B) USE THE PREMISES AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE PREMISES FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS, TOGETHER, THE "OBJECTS".
Area of benefit
CANNOCK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Avon Business & Leisure Ltd
Avon Road
Cannock
WS11 1LH
- Phone:
- 01543503163
- Email:
- abllcannock@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window