Financial history EAST EUROPEAN RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity number: 1114607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £680.46k £819.70k £775.98k £1.12m £1.03m
Total expenditure £535.84k £641.64k £763.80k £853.18k £1.01m
Income from government contracts £82.00k £12.85k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £373.16k £291.99k £308.62k £487.37k £391.78k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £5.25k £5.48k £2.72k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £675.77k £807.92k £765.07k £1.12m £1.03m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £88 £51 £7 £1.14k £2.34k
Income - Other £4.60k £6.48k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £529.82k £600.76k £729.84k £822.88k £977.41k
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.02k £40.88k £33.96k £30.30k £30.30k
Expenditure - Governance £2.25k £3.02k £3.03k £3.51k £3.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.23k