AFRICAN FRENCH SPEAKINGORGANISATION 'A.F.S.OR'

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education: ESOL sessions; After school education; Sportive and recreational activities; Volunteer Schemes; Trainings; Seminars; Anti-Social Behaviour workshops; Interpreting and Translation, Counselling and Advocacy services; Medical/Health/Sickness and Disability information; Relief of Poverty; Housing/Accommodation; Arts/Culture; Economic/Community development/Employment;Acts as resource body
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnet
- Brent
- Camden
- Enfield
- Greenwich
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
- Lambeth
Governance
- 21 March 2007: Standard registration
- AFRICANS FRENCH SPEAKING ORGANISATION 'AFSOR' (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maaza Ashmelash | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Birhane Tsehaye | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lazarus Gabriel | Trustee | 22 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.92k | £24.68k | £13.30k | £2.80k | £3.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.79k | £25.56k | £17.68k | £9.15k | £3.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 AUGUST 2005 AS AMENDED 18 FEBRUARY 2007 AND 9 JUNE 2007 AND 2ND AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS AND MIGRANTS IN THE AFRICAN FRENCH SPEAKING COMMUNITIES RESIDING IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF BARNET, BRENT, BROXBOURNE, CAMDEN, ENFIELD, HACKNEY, HARINGEY, ISLINGTON, LAMBETH AND WALTHAM FOREST BY: 1. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH ADVICE ON HEALTH, HOUSING, EDUCATION AND SOCIAL ISSUES; 2. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
BARNET, BRENT, BROXBOURNE, CAMDEN, ENFIELD, HACKNEY, HARINGEY, ISLINGTON, LAMBETH, WALTHAM FOREST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROOM 4
Community House
311 Fore Street
Edmonton
LONDON
N9 0PZ
- Phone:
- 02083736200
- Email:
- afsorlondon307@yahoo.fr
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window