THE TUTU FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Tutu Foundation Uk works to build the capacity of people and frontline community groups who want to make a difference in their local community. The Tutu Foundation promotes the living legacy of Archbishop Desmond Tutu & Mrs Leah Tutu through our unique Ubuntu Driven Approach and works to support inclusion, whilst enabling people living in communiies at risk of tension and conflict.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 September 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clive Conway ARAM | Chair | 22 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bloomfield | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Isaac John | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Ella Matheson | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD EVANS | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Professor Gary Martin Staffell Craig | Trustee | 08 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.92k | £176.49k | £617 | £3.29k | £36.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.42k | £116.41k | £55.68k | £21.11k | £26.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 April 2024 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 April 2024 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MARCH 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 AUGUST 2006.
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT OF LEADERSHIP TRAINING PROGRAMMES AND THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS; 2) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION BY (A) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (B) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (C) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; AND (D) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. 3) THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY BY THE PROMOTION OF DIALOGUE AND UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT FAITH AND RACIAL GROUPS; AND 4) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY SENDING VOLUNTEERS TO OTHER COUNTRIES (A) TO SHARE AND DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING AND TO SHARE THEIR EXPERIENCE WITH OTHERS ON RETURN AND (B) TO UNDERTAKE AND ASSIST IN WORKS AND PROJECTS OF ALL KINDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apartment 5
89 Wimbledon Parkside
London
SW19 5LR
- Phone:
- 02079031000
- Email:
- info@tutufoundationuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window