AL-HAIDER TRUST UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We currently organise religious gatherings to celebrate and commemorate special days and events, thoughout the year, especially the Muharram Majalis. Religious preachers and speakers are arranged to address these gatherings and to provide specific religious guidance, as and when required. Literature and other material is also made available to our service users to enhance their knowledge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Redbridge
Governance
- 10 April 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALI ABBASS KHAN | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
YAWAR ABBAS KAZMI | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
HASSAN ZAIGHAM | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
TANZEEL HASSAN | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
HASSAN RAZA | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOHSIN ZAIGHAM | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
AMANAT ALI SHAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED NADEEM RAZA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GHULAM RAZA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAEED ZAIGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NISAR AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FAROOQ AHMED SHAH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.79k | £19.64k | £15.98k | £25.80k | £14.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.59k | £19.50k | £15.55k | £30.03k | £10.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 September 2024 | 238 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 30 September 2024 | 603 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 February 2023 | 368 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SHIA, FIQH E JAFFERIYA, DOCTRINES OF ISLAM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, RELIGIOUS FUNCTIONS, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS. TO FACILITATE THE PERFORMING OF ISLAMIC MARRIAGE CEREMONIES AND BURIAL RITES IN ACCORDANCE WITH SHIA DOCTRINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. LONDON BOROUGH OF REDBRIDGE AND ADJOINING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 LEYTON PARK ROAD
LONDON
E10 5RJ
- Phone:
- 07930820179
- Email:
- alhaidertrust@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window