SOUTH ASIAN CONSORTIUM KIRKLEES (SACK)

Charity Number: 1113713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The aims of SACK are 1.To encourage the members to work collaboratively, share resources & provide higher quality social, welfare, educational and health services. 2. Provide a single point for consultation for agencies who wish to improve or increase services to the community. 3. To act as a watchdog for agencies who have responsibilities for providing services to the communities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,553
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Kirklees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 April 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SACK (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sharafat Ali Trustee 21 October 2018
None on record
KUDEJA KHATUN Trustee
None on record
JAMIL AKHTAR MBE JP Trustee
None on record
Abdul Aslam Trustee
None on record
FIAZ IQBAL RASHID Trustee
None on record
MAHOMED SAIED LAHER Trustee
None on record
MOHAMMED LUBSIR LATIF Trustee
RAVENSTHORPE COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED
Received: On time
CAMRAN ISHAQ Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.64k £3.55k £3.55k £3.55k £3.55k
Total expenditure £85 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 February 2024 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
C/O PAKISTAN ASSOCIATION HUDDS.
2 HALL AVENUE
THORNTON LODGE
HUDDERSFIELD
HD1 3NL
Phone:
07786651368