THE ROTARY CLUB OF MARKET BOSWORTH TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to help the mentally and physically handicapped locally and in third world countries Also helping with international disasters And other local charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
- Zambia
Governance
- 06 April 2006: Standard registration
- MARKET BOSWORTH ROTARY CLUB (Working name)
- THE ROTARY CLUB OF MARKET BOSWORTH TRUST FUND (Working name)
- ROTARY CLUB OF MARKET BOSWORTH (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Kitson | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|||||
John Hayes | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Harris | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Warwack | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DEREK CRANE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT OWEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.07k | £10.19k | £32.13k | £12.65k | £15.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.35k | £6.85k | £28.67k | £19.46k | £14.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 232 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CLUB SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE LEICESTERSHIRE AND WARWICKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Sycamore Way
Market Bosworth
NUNEATON
Warwickshire
CV13 0LU
- Phone:
- 01455290338
- Email:
- brianlindacox@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window