THE FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS, MAPPLETON & ST GILES, GOXHILL PARISH CHURCHES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve two churches & promote the history of these churches
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 24 May 2006: Standard registration
- 18 January 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- FRIENDS OF MAPPLETON AND GOXHILL CHURCHES (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £684 | £613 | £500 | £396 | £530 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8 | £2.86k | £300 | £3.38k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 14 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APRIL 2006, AS AMENDED 23 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY RAISING FUNDS FOR PRESERVING, MAINTAINING, REPAIRING AND ADORNING MAPPLETON AND GOXHILL CHURCHES IN COOPERATION WITH THE MAPPLETON & GOXHILL PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, YORKSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window