AL HUDA ACADEMY & ISLAMIC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To ran advice & information sesions for the local Muslim community, run prayer sesisons, organsie cultural and religious events; Ran supplementary and religious education classess. To organise capacity bulding training programme for the local elderly and young people. To ran elderly sessios for the peopel with disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 22 May 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Moulana Shah Mizanul Haque | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Anisur Rahman | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD ABDUL QUADIR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ASHAB BAIG | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.18k | £5.00k | £2.50k | £3.20k | £1.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.93k | £4.30k | £2.45k | £2.90k | £1.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 May 2024 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 February 2021 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 NOVEMBER 2005/
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH COMMUNITY IN AND AROUND LONDON, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THOSE INHABITANTS WHO ARE OF MUSLIM ORIGIN AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: (I) TO ADVANCE OF EDUCATION AMONG MEMBERS OF MUSLIM COMMUNITIES WITHIN THE LONDON, IN PARTICULAR WITHIN THE GREATER LONDON AREA, BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTARY MOTHER TONGUE CLASSES FOR STUDENTS UNDERACHIEVING IN MAINSTREAM EDUCATION. (II) THE PROVISION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION AMONG MEMBERS OF MUSLIM COMMUNITIES WITHIN THE TOWER HAMLETS AND IN PARTICULAR THE LONDON AREA, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LONDON - TOWER HAMLETS
Contact information
- Address:
-
119-121 Whitechapel Road
119-121 Whitechapel Road
LONDON
E1 1DT
- Phone:
- 07585911079
- Email:
- QUADIRSALEH@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window