A LEG TO STAND ON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 February 2007: Standard registration
- ALTSO (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Greg Winterton | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDRA Galligan | Trustee | 22 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
SALEEM ANWAR SIDDIQI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.06k | £6.60k | £6.93k | £0 | £19 | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.50k | £5.64k | £6.77k | £0 | £280 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 September 2024 | 233 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 April 2023 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 April 2023 | 423 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 April 2023 | 788 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 September 2024 | 1328 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 JANUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
3 OBJECTS 3.1 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF CHILDREN WITH LIMB DISABILITIES IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES. 3.2 IN ADDITION TO THE OBJECTS SET OUT IN CLAUSE 3.1 THE TRUSTEES MAY HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR SUCH PURPOSES THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AT LAW.
Area of benefit
IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 123, 4 Montpelier Street
LONDON
Sw7 1EE
- Phone:
- 02074991830
- Email:
- alexandra@musst.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window