Financial history TOWERGATE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1117359
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £1.40m £1.05m £445.25k £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.40m £1.04m £467.87k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Donations and legacies £1.40m £1.05m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £1.58k £1.23k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.33m £980.91k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £13.90k £12.88k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.33m £980.91k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A