Financial history CATHERINE OF SIENA EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1115065
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £77.34k £102.82k £101.22k £84.51k £0
Total expenditure £75.99k £79.03k £65.89k £35.05k £529
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A