AFRICAN FRANCOPHONE RESOURCE AND INFORMATION CENTRE, AFRIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Caters for the needs of French-Speaking African migrants in London Offers high quality, free, impartial and confidential information, advice and guidance on welfare rights issues and immigration, nationality and asylum matters to all migrants Runs a befriending service for those in detention centres and hospitals Interpretation/Translation service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 July 2006: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 08 April 2013: Re-registered
- AFRIC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAMPO GERARD GUILLET | Trustee | 26 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ADAH LIDWINA MAVOUNGO-PEMBA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BICKY MAIXENNE SOUMINA SOUALA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YAO ALEXIS KOUADIO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FAUSTIN MABA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.89k | £8.79k | £8.81k | £8.88k | £8.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.61k | £8.62k | £8.70k | £8.71k | £8.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED 11 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE NEEDS OF FRENCH SPEAKING AFRICAN MIGRANTS IN LONDON.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Hargood Road
LONDON
Blackheath
SE3 8HR
- Phone:
- 07535204052
- Email:
- afric3@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window