Financial history AKIM ACHIASE KROYE (KUO) ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1116611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £240 £240 £325 £480 £480
Total expenditure £0 £0 £25 £320 £140
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A