CLIFTON COLLEGE ENDOWMENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of scholarships, educational grants and bursaries and other grants for the benefit of or in connection with Clifton College.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bristol City
Governance
- 16 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Morris | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Philip Preston | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Millington Reece | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Harris | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Rudge | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Bailey | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Turco | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Major Jeremy Dawson Walters | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian D L Hoyle | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Alistair Isaacs | Trustee | 11 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Matthew John Howard-Cairns | Trustee | 06 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Francois Alun Davies | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
|||||
KATE VICTORIA HOLLAND-SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK GRAHAM ELDRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £315.13k | £175.65k | £375.92k | £656.89k | £154.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.61k | £164.41k | £196.34k | £202.33k | £218.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £560.41k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £96.48k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £462.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £164.90k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £37.43k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.22k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £37.43k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 148 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 December 2022 | 769 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 December 2022 | 769 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 29 OCTOBER 1921
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF OR IN CONNECTION WITH THE COLLEGE AS THE SOCIETY IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION ACTING BY ITS GENERAL COMMITTEE OR ITS EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE (AS THE CASE MAY BE) OR BY ANY PERSON OR PERSONS TO WHOM THE SOCIETY OR EITHER OF THE SAID COMMITTEES MAY DELEGATE ANY POWER IN THAT BEHALF OR ACTING OTHERWISE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE RULES FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE SOCIETY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT NO SUCH PAYMENT OR APPLICATION (EXCEPT BY WAY OF TEMPORARY ACCUMULATION OR PERMANENT ADDITION TO CAPITAL) SHALL BE MADE NOR SHALL ANY DEFINITE ALLOCATION OF ANY SUCH INCOME (EXCEPT FOR ANY ACCUMULATION OR ADDITION AS AFORESAID) BE ALTERED WITHOUT THE APPROVAL OF THE COUNCIL OF THE COLLEGE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE COUNCIL")
Area of benefit
CLIFTON COLLEGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 COLLEGE ROAD
BRISTOL
BS8 3JH
- Phone:
- 01173157665
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window