PEBBLE BEACH CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The collection of funds and to organise events to raise funds to be provided to charities supporting children, the disabled and health projects both locally in Hampshire and Dorset, and in South America.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Brazil
Governance
- 21 September 2006: Standard registration
- 17 September 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.54k | £8.18k | £9.37k | £9.84k | £7.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.43k | £12.28k | £9.24k | £4.56k | £11.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 24 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 15 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN BRAZIL 2. TO SUPPORT CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AND CHARITIES IN HAMPSHIRE AND DORSET PROVIDING RELIEF FOR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
BRAZIL, HAMPSHIRE AND DORSET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window