THE SYLVIA WEBBER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sylvia Webber Trust was established in 2006 to support a select number of charities and projects particularly those that advance the welfare and education of young Jewish people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
Governance
- 21 July 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ALAN WEBBER | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
LUCINDA JANE LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Miles Jason Webber | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.23k | £92.37k | £115.46k | £69.27k | £92.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.50k | £91.00k | £19.08k | £163.46k | £80.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 06 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 06 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED AGREED 13 FEBRUARY 2006 AS AMENDED 12 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION) OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ISRAEL BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS AND OTHER SUCH ITEMS AS DEEMED NECESSARY BY THE TRUSTEES 2. TO SUPPORT THE JEWISH INSTITUTIONS IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF JEWISH RELIGION AND/OR EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ISRAEL. 3. TO SUPPORT JEWISH INSTITUTIONS WHICH ASSIST PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME, OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ISRAEL WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 4. TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS OR DISTRESS AND FURTHER GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ISRAEL WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH HELP"
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ISRAEL
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 NEW CHURCH ROAD
HOVE
BN3 4BA
- Phone:
- 07917585802
- Email:
- SylviaWebberTrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window