UNION OF BRITISH MESSIANIC SYNAGOGUES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE UBMS EXISTS TO PROVIDE A NATIONAL STRUCTURE TO MESSIANIC JEWISH SYNAGOGUES IN THE UK, WITH SUPPORT FOR THOSE OUTSIDE THE UK IF REQUESTED. THE UNION HAS OVERSIGHT OF AND ACCOUNTABILITY STRUCTURES FOR RABBIS AND RABBINIC INTERNS, AS WELL AS ORGANISING CONFERENCES AND TRAINING ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Romania
- Ukraine
Governance
- 24 November 2006: Standard registration
- UBMS (Working name)
- UBMJC (Previous name)
- UNION OF BRITISH MESSIANIC JEWISH CONGREGATIONS (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lenka Carbonell Marvan | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RABBI BRIAN SABEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.17k | £67.33k | £12.86k | £18.79k | £15.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.01k | £66.92k | £9.87k | £15.28k | £12.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28/08/2006 AS AMENDED ON 24/03/2012
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE JEWISH FAITH THROUGH THE TEACHINGS OF YESHUA THE MESSIAH IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 2) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TOME MAY THINK FIT. 3) TO TRAIN, TEACH AND EDUCATE THROUGH REGULAR CONFERENCES AND DEDICATED SEMINARS ALL THOSE WHO SEEK TO UNDERSTAND THE MESSIANIC JEWISH FAITH AND LIFESTYLE. 4) TO TRAIN, TEACH AND EDUCATE AND HAVE OVERSIGHT OVER ALL NATIONAL UK (AND ELSEWHERE AS REQUESTED) CONGREGATIONAL LEADERS. 5) TO OPERATE AN ACCOUNTABILITY STRUCTURE FOR ALL CONGREGATIONAL LEADERS MENTIONED IN 4.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Essex Street
NORWICH
NR2 2BL
- Phone:
- 01603464367
- Email:
- UBMS@ubmsonline.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window