Accounts and annual returns BRIGHT START PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1114865
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2012 24 March 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 05 April 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2011 19 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 19 April 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2010 27 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 27 January 2011 On Time