BEBO CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
There has been no movement for this charity it is a dormant charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 August 2006: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 19 February 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 19 February 2009 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 7 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATIONAL AND DEVELOPMENTAL TRAINING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN RURAL COMMUNITIES IN LESS DEVELOPED COUNTRIES, IN PARTICULAR WITH A VIEW TO ENABLING COMMUNITIES TO MAKE SUSTAINABLE USE OF AVAILABLE RESOURCES AND EQUIPMENT SO THAT THEY MAY BETTER MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window