THE FRIENDS OF DITCHLING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is responsible for the land and buildings known as "Ditchling Village Green". A barn and the green are hired out for weddings and other events. The trustees then use the funds generated to maintain the facilities and make improvements to both the barn and green. The principle aim being to retain the area as a green space, with access for villagers to use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 10 May 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Jane Duncan | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Katherine Rivers - Moore | Trustee | 27 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
COLIN MARSHALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.69k | £2.29k | £10.56k | £13.77k | £12.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.77k | £6.52k | £5.81k | £7.42k | £11.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 294 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
1 TO ACQUIRE AND PRESERVE PROPERTY IN THE PARISH OF DITCHLING IN EAST SUSSEX AS OPEN SPACES FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID PARISH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD. 2 TO FURTHER OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID PARISH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DITCHLING, EAST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
COURT COTTAGE
LODGE HILL LANE
DITCHLING
HASSOCKS
BN6 8SP
- Phone:
- 07968562304
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window