EASY HOUSING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY & UNEMPLOYMENT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION & THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG HOMELESS PEOPLE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE ECONOMICAL & SOCIAL DISADVANTAGED MEMBER OF SOCIETY, SUCH AS THE MINORITY ETHIC COMMUNITY, MENTAL HEALTH PATIENTS, ELDERLY PEOPLE, DISABLED & THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL HOUSING AND SUPPORT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
- Bristol City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 August 2006: Standard registration
- EASY HOUSING (Working name)
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ahmed Abdi Mohamed | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Ibrahim | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Musa Noor | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yussuf Ahmed | Trustee | 18 January 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.70m | £1.86m | £2.17m | £2.66m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.61m | £1.81m | £2.16m | £2.39m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.70m | £1.86m | £2.17m | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.61m | £1.81m | £2.16m | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.39m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 13 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND UNEMPLOYMENT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG HOMELESS PEOPLE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE ECONOMICALLY AND SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY SUCH AS THE MINORITY ETHNIC COMMUNITY, MENTAL HEALTH PATIENTS, ELDERLY PEOPLE, THOSE WITH DISABILITIES, EX-OFFENDERS, OTHER VULNERABLE GROUPS AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATIONS AND QUALIFIED SUPPORT, ADVICE AND TRAINING.HE FAUNA AND FLORA OF ORCHARDS.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
F4 Kingsbury House
468 Church Lane
Kingsbury
London
NW9 8UA
- Phone:
- 02082002441
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window