RAVENSCLIFFE COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the communities of Ravenscliffe and Greengates, helping them to identify problems in the area through community consultations. Also design intervention strategies, support projects to fundraise for activities, link and network with others, assist them to function well ( management meetings, constitutions, AGM's), learn from what they do and monitor and evaluate projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £30,000 from government contract(s) and £25,220 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bradford City
Governance
- 09 August 2006: Standard registration
- 30 March 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- RCDP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.47k | £62.77k | £57.30k | £57.20k | £55.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.92k | £36.13k | £72.20k | £69.07k | £48.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £30.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £26.28k | £25.22k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 13 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
13 September 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 16 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 16 July 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 26 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 26 June 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 01 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 01 October 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 FEBRUARY 2006 AS AMENDED 15 JUNE 2006 AND 26 MAY 2010.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHIN THE AREA OF RAVENSCLIFFE AND GREENGATES IN BRADFORD AND SURROUNDING COMMUNITIES WITH THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS: 1)TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASONS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. 2) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND POVERTY 3) TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING INCLUDING TRAINING IN SKILLS RELEVANT TO SECURING EMPLOYMENT. 4) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS 5) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR PUBLIC RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE 6) TO PROTECT OR CONSERVE THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT 7) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC (INCLUDING INDIVIDUAL COMMUNITIES DEFINED BY GEOGRAPHICAL AREAS IN WHICH THEY LIVE OR WORK OR THEIR ETHNICAL ORIGINS) AS THE ORGANISATION SHALL THINK FIT PROVIDED THAT IN FURTHERANCE OF ALL OR ANY OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS THE ORGANISATION SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO PROMOTE, PROVIDE OR ASSIST ACTIVITIES OUTSIDE THE AREA REFERRED TO ABOVE WHERE IT IS OF THE OPINION THAT TO DO SO WILL BENEFIT THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID AREA
Area of benefit
THE AREA OF RAVENSCLIFFE AND GREENGATES IN BRADFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window