CORACLE

Charity Number: 1114326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting a holistically healthy lifestyle based on the teachings of the Vedas as presented by HDG A.C.Bhaktivedanta Swami Prabhupada with a current focus on developing ecologically friendly, sustainable community. Teaching music, meditation and vegetarian cooking. Promoting other forms of positive recreation. Providing facilities and venues for the above.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £29,462
Total expenditure: £40,983

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City
  • Dorset
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 May 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • CORACLE (Working name)
  • CORACLE (Previous name)
  • HARE KRISHNA INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr DENE SCHWARZ MBBS Chair
None on record
jennifer calviac Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £43.07k £23.62k £46.06k £32.16k £29.46k
Total expenditure £46.40k £15.67k £28.05k £44.20k £40.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £12.96k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
21A PRINCE ALBERT STREET
Brighton
BN1 1HF
Phone:
07905263310