GECKO SRI LANKA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through a yearly agenda of fundraising events, we aim to donate items such as food, clothing, medical equipment, education materials, services or facilities to individuals, establishments, or organisations (including other charities). This will primarily target those in financial/medical/educational need or victims of disaster (including natural and war related).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 11 January 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 23 November 2006: Standard registration
- GIVING ESSENTIAL CARE AND KEY OPPORTUNITIES SRI LANKA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MADURA KELUM PERERA JAYATUNGA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr SAVINI GUNATILAKE | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
RAVEEN JAYASURIYA | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
KATY JAYASURIYA | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ARRAN SOLOMONSZ | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
NILMINI HERATH | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr DILANI PERERA | Trustee | 15 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr DHARSHIKA SRIKANTHARAJAH | Trustee | 11 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr DENESH SRIKANTHARAJAH | Trustee | 15 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr AARTHY RADHAKRISHNAN | Trustee | 15 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ASHAN HERATH | Trustee | 01 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
JEEVANA WIKUM PERERA JAYATUNGA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
INDUNIL NIKINI PERERA ARULANANDAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr SEMINI GREENING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 11/01/2020 | 11/01/2021 | 11/01/2022 | 11/01/2023 | 11/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.61k | £0 | £1.49k | £10 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £806 | £750 | £1.03k | £1.53k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 11 January 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 January 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 200 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 January 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 January 2021 | 13 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 January 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
3 THE OBJECTS. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: INTERNATIONAL DISASTER RELIEF 1A. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF A NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES AND/OR ORGANISATIONS AFFECTED IN THE REGION OF THE DISASTER [INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID]. 1B. THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL AID TO SUCH PERSONS. RELIEF F FINANCIAL HARDSHIP 2A THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN SRI LANKA [BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS/ SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS]. 2B. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN SRI LANKA BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES; THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR LIVING N SRI LANKA EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION 3A. "TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SCHOOL CHILDREN AND UNIVERSITY STUDENTS IN SRI LANKA BY PROVIDING, AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF, GOODS, SERVICES, EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES IN THEIR EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS." 3B. "TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE SCHOOL CHILDREN AND UNIVERSITY STUDENTS IN SRI LANKA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS" RELIEF OF SICKNESS 4A. "THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN SRI LANKA". 4B. "TO ASSIST N THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK AND RECREATION". 4C. (1) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF ANY MEDICAL CONDITION, EITHER PHYSICAL OR MENTAL, IN SRI LANKA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN HEALTH CARE BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION 4D. "TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITALS/MEDICAL PRACTICES/OTHER MEDICAL ESTABLISHMENTS OF SRI LANKA BY PROVIDING AND/OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
SRI LANKA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 ALMOND GROVE
NORTHALLERTON
DL7 8RQ
- Phone:
- 07890721714
- Email:
- geckosrilanka@gmail.com
- Website:
-
geckosrilanka.wordpress.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window