HI-CAP UK (HERITAGE AND CULTURE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hi-Cap UK work in the remote areas of the Himalaya's We identify families in real need, through visiting and investigation. We identify their basic needs and work towards provision to release them from poverty. We Have implemented community based educational projects We are working towards keeping families together We are giving children in these areas a chance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nepal
Governance
- 17 July 2006: Standard registration
- HI-CAP UK (HIMALAYAN CONSERVATION) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Olubunmi Agbede | Trustee | 29 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elcudates | Trustee | 12 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Freda Casagrande | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID GRAHAM WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.87k | £8.11k | £9.07k | £10.05k | £8.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.08k | £7.98k | £9.14k | £9.68k | £8.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED 15 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED ON 13/10/2015
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, CULTURE AND PRACTICES OF THE LOMANTHANG AND MUSTANG AREA. 2 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH FOR THE CHILDREN AND ADULTS OF THE NEPALESE REGION OF LOMANTHANG AND MUSTANG AREA. 3 TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN LOMANTHANG AND MUSTANG, PARTICULARLY FOR THE CHILDREN, AND ASSIST IN SETTING UP AND MAINTAINING AN ORPHANAGE TO HELP ACHIEVE THIS OBJECT.
Area of benefit
NEPALESE REGION OF LOMANTHANG AND MUSTANG
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Albert Street
Blaenllechau
FERNDALE
Mid Glamorgan
CF43 4NW
- Phone:
- 07968524379
- Email:
- freda@hicap.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window