PROSTHETICS AND ORTHOTICS REHABILITATION TECHNOLOGY - EDUCATION AND RESEARCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prosthetics, Orthotics,Rehabilitation Technology- Education and Research encourages safe standards of care through the education of clinicians to Internationally recognised standards. The advancement of knowledge of prosthetics and orthotics is supported through the dissemination of information and though innovative practices.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- India
- Malawi
- Scotland
- Uganda
Governance
- 01 November 2006: Standard registration
- 16 November 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 16 November 2020: Funds transferred to 800435 THE DOUGLAS BADER FOUNDATION
- PORT-ER (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 30/09/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.11k | £8.63k | £5.75k | £2.26k | £2 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.03k | £7.11k | £7.40k | £1.53k | £2.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 08 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 26 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 OCTOBER 2006.
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE GOOD HEALTH OF PERSONS REQUIRING PROSTHETIC AND ORTHOTIC CARE IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY; (3.1) ENCOURAGING SAFE STANDARDS OF PROSTHETIC AND ORTHOTIC CARE THROUGH THE EDUCATION OF CLINICIANS TO INTERNATIONALLY RECOGNISED STANDARDS; (3.2) SUPPORTING THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE IN PROSTHETICS AND ORTHOTICS THROUGH THE DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION; (3.3) SUPPORTING INNOVATION IN PROSTHETICS AND ORTHOTICS; (3.4D) PROVIDING FUNDING TO COMMUNITIES OF PATIENTS/USERS TO ENHANCE PATIENT USER EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window