Financial history CONISTON SPORTS AND SOCIAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1121782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £110.94k £89.62k £143.90k £173.39k £177.81k
Total expenditure £115.05k £86.12k £137.32k £188.47k £162.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.86k £30.52k £8.00k N/A N/A