ANTI-TRAFFICKING ALLIANCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ATA is primarily an advocacy, research and awareness raising organisation aimed at reducing levels of trafficking for sexual purposes. We do this through using online media, films and campaigns.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 February 2007: Standard registration
- 12 August 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9 | £3 | £0 | £80 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.91k | £2.71k | £1.25k | £269 | £167 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 05 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 05 June 2015 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 31 May 2014 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO PREVENT, TACKLE AND ELIMINATE HUMAN TRAFFICKING AND TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF THE VICTIMS BY: A) PROVIDING PRACTICAL SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE VIA PARTNER ORGANISATIONS. B) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING IN PARTICULAR THE CONSEQUENCES FOR, AND NEEDS OF, VICTIMS. C) UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING AND DISSEMINATING THE RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window