Maryport Rescue

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation of a rescue boat.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
33 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 19 April 2006: Standard registration
- MARYPORT INSHORE RESCUE BOAT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Messenger | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Daniel Brannon | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
george farish | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marc Gibson | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
michael taylor | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Hampson | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Messenger | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MARK NORMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/07/2020 | 24/07/2021 | 24/07/2022 | 24/07/2023 | 24/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.41k | £214.09k | £380.75k | £93.58k | £203.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.10k | £83.29k | £160.24k | £126.08k | £144.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 July 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 July 2023 | 03 October 2024 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2023 | 03 October 2024 | 132 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 July 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 July 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 July 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 FEBRUARY 2006 as amended on 26 Jul 2022 as amended on 27 May 2022
Charitable objects
3.1 To operate for the public benefit for the preservation and saving of life at sea or on the foreshore by the acquisition, fitting out and maintenance of a lifeboat to operate from Maryport in the county of Cumbria 3.2 To operate a swift water rescue team in Cumbria and other areas as required 3.3 To operate a search and rescue team working in partnership with the Coastguard and Police services 3.4 To advance education and training on lifeboat and other water rescue services
Area of benefit
MARYPORT IN THE COUNTY OF CUMBRIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maryport Inshore Rescue Service
Marine Road
MARYPORT
Cumbria
CA15 8AY
- Phone:
- 01900810513
- Email:
- maryportrescue@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
maryportrescue.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window