Accounts and annual returns RUCSTALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1114366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 26 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 26 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 January 2025 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 January 2025 78 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 June 2023 240 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 July 2023 243 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required