Accounts and annual returns NICARAGUA EDUCATION, CULTURE AND ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1114483
Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 May 2024 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 July 2023 257 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 January 2022 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 January 2022 84 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required