NICARAGUA EDUCATION, CULTURE AND ARTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Nicaragua Education Culture and Arts Trust raises funds for educational projects and for the relief of poverty in the area of Leon, Nicaragua. The projects use the medium of culture and the arts as a vehicle for this education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nicaragua
Governance
- 01 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Monika Christine Schiffer | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret St John | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|||||
MARTIN CHARLES ROGER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.19k | £22.03k | £29.92k | £22.46k | £19.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.14k | £24.40k | £25.68k | £22.08k | £23.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 May 2024 | 194 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2023 | 257 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 January 2022 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 January 2022 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 AUGUST 2004
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH CULTURE AND THE ARTS (B) THE ALLEVIATION OF POVERTY AND HARDSHIP (C) THE CHARITY WILL OPERATE IN THE PACIFIC COAST REGION OF NICARAGUA.
Area of benefit
THE PACIFIC COAST REGION OF NICARAGUA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 Boddington Road
Wendover
Aylesbury
HP22 6HY
- Phone:
- 01296696925
- Email:
- info@necat.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window