WHITBY BRUNSWICK CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT, EDUCATION AND COUNSELLING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 July 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Middlesbrough
- North Yorkshire
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 14 July 2006: Standard registration
- 13 August 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 30/07/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.90k | £9.20k | £7.10k | £5.51k | £5.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.68k | £14.75k | £8.96k | £19.45k | £8.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 July 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 July 2021 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 14 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED AND TO PROTECT HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF AN EFFECTIVE COUNSELLING, MENTORING AND LIFE COACHING SERVICE PARTICULARLY FOR PERSONS FROM ECONOMICALLY OR SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUNDS WITH A VIEW TO RAISING PEOPLE'S CAPACITY AND PROMOTING THEIR ACTIVE INVOLVEMENT IN SOCIETY. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREAS OF COUNSELLING, MENTORING AND LIFE COACHING PARTICULARLY FOR THOSE WORKING OR WISHING TO WORK IN THESE AREAS. 3. TO PROMOTE VOLUNTEERING ACTIVITIES AND RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT BY PROVIDING THE RELEVANT TRAINING, SUPPORT AND SKILLS TO THOSE IN NEED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BY GI BUT IN PRACTICE NORTH YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window