THE CHIDDINGFOLD ARCHIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a resource centre for archival material concerning Chiddingfold, its history, architecture and people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 25 May 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM HAMILTON CODRINGTON NATION | Chair | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Iona Honor Everett | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARY DIANA EDGAR | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
BELINDA JANE SANDERS | Trustee | 10 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ARTHUR TAGG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH LOUISE CARTLEDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.63k | £4.60k | £1.95k | £3.26k | £2.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.33k | £4.01k | £2.33k | £2.04k | £2.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE PARISH OF CHIDDINGFOLD, SURREY AND THE RESIDENTS OF SURROUNDING PARISHES BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ARCHIVE OF CHIDDINGFOLD AND ITS ENVIRONS AND BY FOSTERING AN INTEREST IN AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE HISTORY, ARCHITECTURE AND CULTURE OF CHIDDINGFOLD AND ITS INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHIDDINGFOLD, SURREY AND THE RESIDENTS OF SURROUNDING PARISHES
Contact information
- Address:
-
102
High Street
Godalming
Godalming
GU7 1EP
- Phone:
- 01483416101
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window