PATRIARCHATE OF BULGARIA BULGARIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH 'ST IOAN RILSKI'

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ÔÇ£To advance the Christian Religion for the benefit of the public in accordance with the doctrines of the orthodox faith through the holding of prayer meetings, lectures [public celebration of religious festivals] producing and/or distributing literature on Christianity to enlighten others about the Christian religion.ÔÇØ
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 October 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Bulgaria
- Ireland
Governance
- 20 November 2006: Standard registration
- BULGARIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH PARISH 'ST. JOHN OF RILA' (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASST PROF EMIL ZARKOV FCCA | Chair | 19 January 2006 |
|
|
||||
V. REVD SIMEON ILIEV | Trustee | 19 January 2006 |
|
|
||||
TZVETAN PETROV | Trustee | 19 January 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/10/2018 | 18/10/2019 | 18/10/2020 | 18/10/2021 | 18/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.96k | £5.95k | £2.83k | £2.70k | £629 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.32k | £4.20k | £1.52k | £450 | £2.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 261 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 261 days | |
Annual return | 18 October 2022 | 23 October 2023 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 October 2021 | 18 October 2022 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 October 2020 | 06 March 2022 | 200 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 October 2019 | 18 October 2020 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JANUARY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE ORTHODOX FAITH THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES (PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS) PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BULGARIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O St. Ioan Rilsky Chapel
6 Hamilton Road
LONDON
NW11 9EJ
- Phone:
- 02087316614
- Email:
- st.ioan.rilsky@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window