FRIENDS SUPPORTING MILLWALL RUGBY FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1119206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting rugby in the East part of London in particular, encouraging Youth participation in Rugby

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Tower Hamlets

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 May 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRIENDS SUPPORTING MRFC (Working name)
  • FRIENDS OF MILLWALL RUGBY CLUB (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Xuxuan Hu Chair 01 June 2022
None on record
Sebastien Jerome Marie Villard Trustee 15 January 2025
None on record
Toby Sanders Trustee 14 January 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.03k £15.21k £2.28k £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £20 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 June 2024 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 01 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Millwall Rugby Club
75 Manchester Road
LONDON
E14 3DN
Phone:
07375218977
Website:

millwallrugbyclub.com.friends