STOKE YOUTH MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Development of young people through the medium of musical theatre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 29 January 2007: Standard registration
- 20 January 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 20 January 2015: Funds transferred to 1144349 STOKE YOUTH MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY
- STOKE YOUTH (Working name)
- SYMTC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.92k | £24.08k | £11.06k | £31.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.20k | £18.09k | £10.86k | £35.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 24 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 24 January 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 13 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS, AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE STOKE ON TRENT STAFFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window