FATIMA WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide assistance to people in poverty, advancement of religion and education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Afghanistan
- India
- Jordan
- Malawi
- The Gambia
Governance
- 28 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUSSAIN VIKA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ABDULLAH MOHAMMED VIKA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADAM MOHAMMED VIKA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LUKMAN ABDULLAH VIKA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALI MOHAMED VIKA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/10/2019 | 15/10/2020 | 15/10/2021 | 15/10/2022 | 15/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.79k | £159.59k | £175.80k | £198.28k | £193.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.34k | £143.36k | £152.27k | £136.25k | £204.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 October 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 October 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 October 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 October 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 October 2019 | 18 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2019 | 18 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
(I) ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION (II) RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP (III) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION
Area of benefit
INDIAN SUBCONTINENT AND ASIA. AFRICA, EUROPE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 ALTOM STREET
BLACKBURN
BB1 7LJ
- Phone:
- 07944759005
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window