Trustees PETWORTH FESTIVAL
Charity number: 1113784

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Barry Franks | Chair | 21 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brian Douglas Lanaghan | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julia Helen Cussins | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
IAN EDWARD BARLOW | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Fiona Reid Jones | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hamilton | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Douglas James Rae | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Ann Willis | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.