THE JAMES BALDWIN TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The James Baldwin Trust helps young adults being treated for T-Cell non-Hodgkins Lymphona. It contributes towards or meets the cost of accomodation and travel for the patient and close family and friends when treatment is given at a hospital which is a significant distance from their home. The Trust also aims to fund research into a cure for T-Cell non-Hodgkin's Lymphoma.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 May 2006: Standard registration
- 18 August 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.88k | £14.34k | £29.15k | £14.82k | £5.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.14k | £26.49k | £27.59k | £24.70k | £23.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF YOUNG ADULTS SUFFERING FROM T-CELL NON-HODGKIN'S LYMPHOMA AND THEIR CLOSE FAMILY AND FRIENDS (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window