Financial history AMANA EDUCATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1113795
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2008 31/05/2009 31/05/2010 31/05/2013 31/05/2014
Total gross income £39.50k £107.49k £90.56k £0 £0
Total expenditure £54.23k £89.67k £78.49k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A