FOREST FIELDS ADVICE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charitys objectives and activities are: To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Forest Fields and the Neighbourhood, in an effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation. Establish, or secure the establishment of a community centre. To promote such other charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 19 July 2007: Standard registration
- FFNAC (Working name)
- FOREST FIELDS ADVICE CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FARZANA ALI CHOUDHARY | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
TASAWAR CHAUDRY | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK BOWYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAWAID KHALIL | Trustee |
|
||||||
HASSAN AHMED | Trustee |
|
||||||
Jean-Didier Mualaba | Trustee |
|
||||||
ARIFA HASSAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.44k | £41.02k | £13.14k | £27.96k | £8.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.03k | £25.20k | £26.41k | £29.31k | £10.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.49k | £5.89k | £18.88k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 141 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AND REVISED 23 FEBRUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
2. OBJECTIVES THE OBJECTIVES OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO: (A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF FOREST FIELDS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, TOGETHER DEFINED BY THE MAP ATTACHED WITH BOUNDARY MARKED (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER, THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS, IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED ('THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONG OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTIVES. (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
FOREST FIELDS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 RUGBY ROAD
WEST BRIDGFORD
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 7HY
- Phone:
- 07973147057
- Website:
-
WWW.FORESTFIELDSADVICECENTRE.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window