TISBURY AND DISTRICT LINK SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To offer practical assistance by providing transport by car to anyone living in the area. Available to anyone living in Tisbury and surrounding villages as listed in the Constitution
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 27 March 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Budd OBE | Chair | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALASTAIR BROWN | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JOHN ADDY | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Antonia Caroline Plumptre | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Mary Shallcross | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Naish | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sally Naish | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.87k | £9.30k | £8.86k | £9.68k | £10.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.51k | £7.95k | £8.02k | £8.49k | £10.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 DECEMBER 2006. as amended on 20 Jun 2012 as amended on 01 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POOR, SICK, ELDERLY OR DISABLED PERSONS IN TISBURY, WEST TISBURY, ANSTY, CHILMARK, DONHEAD ST ANDREW, FONTHILL GIFFORD, SEDGEHILL AND SEMLEY, SWALLOWCLIFFE, EAST KNOYLE, FOVANT, SUTTON MANDEVILLE, HINDON, CHICKLADE, PERTWOOD, FONTHILL BISHOP AND BERWICK ST LEONARD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
AS PER OBJECTS CLAUSE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yattendon
Vicarage Road
Tisbury
Salisbury
SP3 6HZ
- Phone:
- 07484284670
- Email:
- tisburylink@gmail.com
- Website:
-
tisburylink.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window