SOUTHAMPTON CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rehearsal for, and production of Choral Concerts with Choir, soloists and orchestral or keyboard accompaniment.Takes part in Civic events including Remembrance Service, provides celebration choir for events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 20 April 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Cobley | Trustee | 10 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Connell | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Thompson | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Powell | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
DIANA BARNES | Trustee | 23 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER KENNETH FORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSALEEN PATRICIA WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JACK PEARCE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.39k | £9.81k | £28.08k | £23.70k | £25.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.80k | £5.38k | £26.13k | £25.01k | £23.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 NOVEMBER 1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF THE ART OF MUSIC WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO CHORAL WORKS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Shanklin Crescent
SHIRLEY
SOUTHAMPTON
SO15 7RB
- Phone:
- 02380552911
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window